Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00154-CR    
02-17-00154-CR
05/16/2017
Attempted Murder
Alan Patrick Fowler 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/03/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
12/11/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
10/04/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
09/18/2018Submitted 
07/12/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
07/05/2018Case ready to be set 
07/03/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/10/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/10/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/11/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
11/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/09/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/22/2017Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/19/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
09/11/2017Motion received 
09/07/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
09/07/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
09/05/2017Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
09/05/2017Case reinstated 
08/22/2017Order issuedAbated
08/18/2017Letter received 
08/15/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/15/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/15/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/19/2017Docketing statement filed 
05/16/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/19/2018StatusRelease to publisher
12/05/2018StatusPetition for discretionary review due in Court of Criminal Appeals
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fowler, Alan PatrickCriminal - AppellantLisa Mullen
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
J. Zach Burt
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1 
Tarrant 
Honorable Elizabeth Beach 
1495202R 
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 1 
20 Yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site