Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00151-CR    
02-17-00151-CR
05/12/2017
Attempted Sexual Assault
Thomas Erickson 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/04/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedState
11/02/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/06/2017Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
12/04/2017Case ready to be set 
12/04/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
11/02/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/02/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
10/30/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/19/2017Notice of late brief 
08/09/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/08/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/13/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
07/06/2017Notice of late record 
06/20/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
05/25/2017Docketing statement filed 
05/12/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/17/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Erickson, ThomasCriminal - AppellantStephen P. Wohr
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasAndrea Simmons
Catherine Luft
Trial Court Information
158th District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Steve Burgess 
F-98-0845-B 
Court Reporter, 158th District Court 
8 Yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site