Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00150-CR    
02-17-00150-CR
05/12/2017
Murder
Leonard Stansberry 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
11/27/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/01/2018Letter filed 
02/27/2018Case ready to be set 
02/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/17/2018Exhibits filed 
12/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/22/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/27/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/02/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/01/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/24/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/11/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/11/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
07/18/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
07/18/2017Clerks record received 
06/13/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
06/12/2017Letter filed 
05/16/2017Docketing statement filed 
05/12/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Stansberry, LeonardCriminal - AppellantJ. Stanley Goodwin
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasLara Tomlin
Catherine Luft
Trial Court Information
362nd District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Robert Bruce McFarling 
F16-216-362 
Court Reporter, 362nd District Court 
25 Yrs IDTDCJ, $10,000 Fine 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site