Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00146-CV    
02-17-00146-CV
05/01/2017
Divorce
Charles J. Baish 
Lisa Desiree Allen 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/13/2018Brief returned for non-compliance with T.R.A.P.Appellant
02/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
01/29/2018Amended brief filedAppellant
01/18/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/02/2018Submitted 
09/14/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
09/13/2018Brief returned for non-compliance with T.R.A.P. 
08/21/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
08/21/2018Motion for oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/20/2018Motion for oral argument filed 
08/16/2018Letter issued by the court 
08/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
03/02/2018Case ready to be set 
02/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/29/2018Amended brief filed 
01/18/2018Corrected brief requested 
01/18/2018Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/18/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/16/2018Motion for leave filed 
12/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/08/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/06/2017Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/22/2017Motion filed 
09/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/18/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/11/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/01/2017Clerks notice to court regarding status of record 
07/28/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/23/2017Letter received 
05/30/2017Appearance of counsel 
05/26/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
05/26/2017Amended notice of appeal filed 
05/25/2017Docketing statement filed 
05/16/2017Notice of late filing fee 
05/16/2017Letter received 
05/04/2017Notice of defect regarding perfection of the notice of appeal 
05/02/2017Letter received 
05/02/2017Letter received 
05/01/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/02/2018SubmittedSubmitted on oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Allen, Lisa D.AppelleeJoseph F. Zellmer
Brian K. Tackett
Baish, III, Charles J.AppellantCharles J. Baish III
Trial Court Information
442nd District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Tiffany Haertling 
16-01896-442 
Court Reporter, 442nd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site