Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00141-CR    
02-17-00141-CR
05/03/2017
Arson
Arturo Acuna 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/07/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
11/13/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
12/07/2017Case ready to be set 
12/07/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/13/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
10/26/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/26/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/24/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/24/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/11/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
05/09/2017Docketing statement filed 
05/03/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
John E. Meskunas
Acuna, ArturoCriminal - AppellantGreg B. Westfall
Trial Court Information
396th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable George William Gallagher 
1442288D 
Court Reporter, 396th District Court 
45 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site