Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00130-CR    
02-17-00130-CR
04/27/2017
Poss of Marihuana
Blas Gregorio Pedraza Morales 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
12/28/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
09/15/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
01/23/2018Case ready to be set 
01/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/29/2017Corrected brief requested 
12/28/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/05/2017Supplemental clerks record filed 
11/21/2017Case reinstated 
11/21/2017Supplemental reporters record filed 
11/01/2017Order issuedAbated
09/18/2017Corrected brief requested 
09/15/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
08/23/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/22/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/15/2017Letter issued by the court 
08/15/2017Motion for extension received 
07/25/2017Notice of late brief 
06/08/2017No reporters record filed in criminal case 
06/05/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
04/27/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Pedraza Morales, Blas GregorioCriminal - AppellantPaul Essenburg
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Trial Court Information
432nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Ruben Gonzalez 
1440881D 
Court Reporter, 432nd District Court  
5 Years Probation, $500 Fine 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site