Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00127-CR    
02-17-00127-CR
04/26/2017
Failure to Register as a Sex Offender
Darnyl Roberts Henderson 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
11/01/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
03/05/2018Case ready to be set 
03/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/01/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/30/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/30/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/01/2017Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/01/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
10/30/2017Motion filed 
10/19/2017Notice of late brief 
09/18/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/15/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/17/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/16/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/26/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasDavid L. Richards
Joseph W. Spence
Henderson, Darnyl RobertsCriminal - AppellantChristopher Mark Nelon
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3 
Tarrant 
Honorable Robb Catalano 
1486901R 
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 3 
Cts. 1, 2 & 3 - 4 Yrs IDTDCJ on ea ct. 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site