Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00124-CR    
02-17-00124-CR
04/26/2017
Sex Offenses
Jesus Iniguez Luna 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
03/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/12/2018Case ready to be set 
06/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/30/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/29/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/31/2018Order entered 
01/25/2018Motion filed 
01/17/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
01/11/2018Supplemental reporters record filed 
01/11/2018Case reinstated 
11/27/2017Letter received 
11/21/2017Order issuedAbated
11/20/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
11/10/2017Notice of late brief 
10/27/2017Telephone call received 
09/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/15/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/11/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
05/11/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
05/09/2017Docketing statement filed 
05/08/2017Order received from trial courtMotion or Writ Granted
04/27/2017Notice of no right to appeal 
04/26/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Luna, Jesus IniguezCriminal - AppellantSteven Todd Jumes
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2 
Tarrant 
Honorable Wayne Francis Salvant 
1426938D 
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 2 
Cts. 1 & 5 - 12 Yrs on ea ct., Cts. 2 & 3 - 20 Yrs on ea ct.  

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site