Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00121-CR    
02-17-00121-CR
04/21/2017
Continuous Sexual Abuse of Young Child or Children
Chris Shane Spencer 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/29/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
11/15/2017Supplemental brief filedAppellant
09/01/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/18/2018Mandate issuedAffirmed
05/30/2018Letter filed 
05/24/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
05/22/2018Submitted 
05/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
12/29/2017Case ready to be set 
12/29/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/15/2017Supplemental brief filed 
11/01/2017Motion to file supplemental brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/30/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
10/30/2017Case reinstated 
10/30/2017Motion to file supplemental brief filed 
10/02/2017Motion to abate appeal disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/02/2017Order issuedAbated
09/29/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/29/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/25/2017Motion to abate appeal filed 
09/01/2017Letter received 
09/01/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
08/08/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/07/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/21/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
04/19/2017Docketing statement filed 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/18/2018Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Spencer, Chris ShaneCriminal - AppellantMark B. Dewitt
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasRobert T. Christian
Megan Chalifoux
Trial Court Information
355th District Court 
Hood 
Honorable Ralph H. Walton, 
CR13544 
Court Reporter, 355th District Court 
Ct. 1 99 Yrs. Ct. 15 10 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site