Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00118-CR    
02-17-00118-CR
04/18/2017
Indecency with a Child
Ronnie James Monroe 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/05/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
11/15/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/17/2018Submitted 
12/11/2017Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
12/05/2017Case ready to be set 
12/05/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/15/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
10/18/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/16/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/07/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/25/2017Notice of late brief 
07/18/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
07/18/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
07/18/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
07/14/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/13/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
06/16/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/14/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
06/08/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
04/29/2017Docketing statement filed 
04/18/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/17/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn E. Meskunas
Joseph W. Spence
Monroe, Ronnie JamesCriminal - AppellantLeigh W. Davis
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2 
Tarrant 
Honorable Wayne Francis Salvant 
1491623R 
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 2 
Life IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site