Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00113-CR    
02-17-00113-CR
04/13/2017
Continuous Sexual Abuse of Young Child or Children
Jaleel Bertrand Franklin 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/06/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
02/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/11/2018Submitted 
07/03/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
06/06/2018Case ready to be set 
06/06/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/05/2018Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/01/2018Motion for leave filed 
01/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/08/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/06/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/10/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/08/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/07/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
04/19/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
04/18/2017Docketing statement filed 
04/13/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/11/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Steven Baker
Franklin, Jaleel BertrandCriminal - AppellantHarmony Mary Schuerman
Trial Court Information
432nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Ruben Gonzalez 
1368033D 
Court Reporter, 432nd District Court  
30 Yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site