Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00090-CR    
02-17-00090-CR
03/21/2017
Indecency with a Child
Doroteo Alaniz 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
12/19/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
09/15/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/23/2018Submitted 
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
02/12/2018Case ready to be set 
02/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/16/2018Certificate of conference filed 
01/11/2018Letter issued by the court 
12/20/2017Telephone call received 
12/19/2017Certification of word count compliance requested 
12/19/2017Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/19/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/01/2017Motion for leave filed 
11/30/2017Letter filed 
11/21/2017Case reinstated 
11/21/2017Supplemental reporters record filed 
11/01/2017Order issuedAbated
09/29/2017Corrected brief requested 
09/15/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/07/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/23/2017Notice of late brief 
08/08/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/07/2017Motion for extension received 
07/25/2017Record was not filed 
07/25/2017Case reinstated 
07/20/2017Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/27/2017Order issuedAbated
06/08/2017Notice of late brief 
05/10/2017Motion received 
05/10/2017Appearance of counsel 
05/03/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/19/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
04/04/2017Docketing statement filed 
03/21/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasCatherine Luft
Alaniz, DoroteoCriminal - AppellantKenneth Weatherspoon
Trial Court Information
211th District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Brody Young Shanklin 
F17-244-211 
Court Reporter, 211th District Court, Denton County 
Cts. 1 & 2 20 Yrs. Ct. 3 10 Yrs. Ct. 4 30 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site