Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00089-CR    
02-17-00089-CR
03/17/2017
Driving While Intoxicated
Richard Moreno Gomez aka Richard Gomez 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/05/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
08/18/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
10/05/2017Case ready to be set 
10/05/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/18/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/18/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
08/08/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/07/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
08/04/2017Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/04/2017Case reinstated 
07/25/2017Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/25/2017Order issuedAbated
07/14/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
06/15/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
06/14/2017Reporters record filed 
03/17/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gomez, Richard Moreno aka Richard GomezCriminal - AppellantAngie Maria Hadley
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMegan Chalifoux
Robert T. Christian
Trial Court Information
355th District Court 
Hood 
Honorable Ralph H. Walton, 
CR13456 
Court Reporter, 355th District Court 
85 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site