Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00086-CR    
02-17-00086-CR
03/15/2017
Aggravated Robbery
Darnell Haynie aka Darnell Haney 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
12/04/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/30/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
08/09/2018Exhibits filed 
08/09/2018Exhibits filed 
08/09/2018Exhibits filed 
08/09/2018Exhibits filed 
08/09/2018Exhibits filed 
08/09/2018Exhibits filed 
08/09/2018Exhibits filed 
07/23/2018Submitted 
07/19/2018Order entered 
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/29/2018Exhibits filed 
06/28/2018Order entered 
05/11/2018Case ready to be set 
05/11/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
05/11/2018Case reinstated 
04/23/2018Order issuedAbated
03/02/2018Case ready to be set 
03/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed 
01/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/04/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
10/03/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/29/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/07/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/04/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/06/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/05/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/27/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
06/14/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/12/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
05/09/2017Letter received 
05/09/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/09/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
05/08/2017Letter received 
05/05/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
03/15/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/15/2018StatusRelease to publisher
10/24/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Andrea Jacobs
Haynie, Darnell Aka Darnell HaneyCriminal - AppellantBrian K. Walker
Trial Court Information
297th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable David C. Hagerman 
1440818D 
Court Reporter, 297th District Court 
40 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site