Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00079-CV    
02-17-00079-CV
03/13/2017
Contract
Larry Joe Morgan 
Benson Varghese 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/27/2017Reply brief filedAppellant
12/15/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
10/16/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/14/2018Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
07/02/2018Letter issued by the court 
07/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
06/28/2018Letter received 
06/21/2018Order issued 
06/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
06/11/2018Fee requested 
06/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
05/24/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
05/22/2018Submitted 
05/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/23/2018Affidavit filed 
04/04/2018Letter issued by the court 
12/27/2017Reply brief filed 
12/15/2017Case ready to be set 
12/15/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/10/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/16/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
08/17/2017Record Sent 
08/08/2017Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/01/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/14/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/13/2017Record Sent 
06/16/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/08/2017Notice of late brief 
04/17/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/12/2017Letter received 
03/31/2017Letter received 
03/31/2017Docketing statement filed 
03/31/2017Notice of late docketing statement 
03/21/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
03/13/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
03/13/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/11/2018Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Morgan, Larry JoeAppellantLarry Joe Morgan
Varghese, Benson AppelleeChristopher W. Ponder
Kathleen Carr Rae
Trial Court Information
342nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable J. Wade Birdwell 
342-285895-16 
Court Reporter, 342nd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site