Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00079-CR    
02-17-00079-CR
03/14/2017
Assault
Kevin Manuel 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/16/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
07/20/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/02/2018Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
03/01/2018Case forwarded to higher court 
02/26/2018Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals 
02/21/2018Letter filed 
02/01/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
01/23/2018Submitted 
01/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
08/16/2017Case ready to be set 
08/16/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/20/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/30/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/26/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/04/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/01/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
03/22/2017Docketing statement filed 
03/14/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/26/2018Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Landon Wade
Manuel, KevinCriminal - AppellantWilliam H. "Bill" Ray
Trial Court Information
396th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable George William Gallagher 
1419285W 
Court Reporter, 396th District Court 
10 Yrs. $299.93 Fine 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site