Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00065-CR    
02-17-00065-CR
03/07/2017
Falsely Holding Oneself Out as a Lawyer
Verba Felicia Peterson 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/08/2017Anders brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/24/2018Mandate issuedAffirmed
08/06/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
07/26/2018Motion for bond or bail disposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/26/2018Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/26/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
07/23/2018Submitted 
07/16/2018Letter filed 
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/21/2018Motion for bond or bail filed 
06/20/2018Letter filed 
05/08/2018Case ready to be set 
05/08/2018Letter filed 
04/24/2018Response was not filed 
02/01/2018Anders response due 
02/01/2018Letter filed 
01/23/2018Order entered 
01/11/2018Response filed 
01/03/2018Response was not filed 
11/21/2017Letter issued by the court 
11/20/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
11/20/2017Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
11/15/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
11/14/2017Case reinstated 
11/14/2017Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
10/25/2017Order issuedAbated
10/24/2017Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
09/27/2017Letter issued by the court 
09/08/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
09/08/2017Anders brief filed 
09/07/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
09/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/19/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/18/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/21/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/19/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
03/15/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
03/15/2017Docketing statement filed 
03/07/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/24/2018Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Peterson, Verba FeliciaCriminal - AppellantVerba Felicia Peterson
Trial Court Information
432nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Ruben Gonzalez 
1460794R 
Court Reporter, 432nd District Court  
3 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site