Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00063-CV    
02-17-00063-CV
03/01/2017
Contract
Enterprising Gals of Texas, L.L.C. d/b/a Wheel Repair Solutions 
Angelica Sprehe, Ryan Sprehe, and ARS Wheel Repair, Inc. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/09/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
12/20/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
10/20/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/09/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
01/02/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
12/21/2017Case ready to be set 
12/20/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/08/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/07/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/20/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
09/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/20/2017Appearance of counsel 
09/19/2017Response filed 
09/19/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/19/2017Appearance of counsel 
08/21/2017Letter received 
08/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/17/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/21/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/19/2017No settlement reached during mediation 
05/18/2017Letter from parties or mediator concerning mediation result 
03/31/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
03/29/2017Mediation order entered 
03/27/2017Letter filed 
03/17/2017Deadline for parties to select mediator 
03/11/2017Docketing statement filed 
03/01/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
03/01/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/30/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
ARS Wheel Repair, Inc.AppelleeEric P. Haas
Enterprising Gals of Texas, L.L.C.AppellantJeffrey S. Lynch
Chad M. Ruback
Sprehe, AngelicaAppelleeEric P. Haas
Sprehe, RyanAppelleeEric P. Haas
Trial Court Information
442nd District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Tiffany Haertling 
14-05411-393 
Court Reporter, 442nd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site