Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00052-CR    
02-17-00052-CR
03/01/2017
Aggravated Assault
Pervis Lee Andrews Jr. 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/15/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
10/15/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/30/2018Submitted 
01/23/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
01/17/2018Letter filed 
01/02/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
12/18/2017Case ready to be set 
12/15/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/17/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/15/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/16/2017Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/15/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
10/13/2017Motion filed 
10/11/2017Motion filed 
08/29/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/02/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
07/26/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/26/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
06/23/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/23/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
06/21/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
03/06/2017Docketing statement filed 
03/01/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/30/2018SubmittedSubmitted on oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasHelena F. Faulkner
Joseph W. Spence
Andrews, Junior, Pervis LeeCriminal - AppellantColin McLaughlin
Trial Court Information
297th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable David C. Hagerman 
1436114D 
Court Reporter, 297th District Court 
Ct. 2 - LIFE  

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site