Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00051-CR    
02-17-00051-CR
02/28/2017
Driving While Intoxicated
Ben Meadway 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/20/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
01/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
02/20/2018Case ready to be set 
02/20/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/25/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
07/18/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/18/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
07/10/2017Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
06/09/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
03/02/2017Docketing statement filed 
02/28/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Meadway, BenCriminal - AppellantAbe Factor
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Jacob Mitchell
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 3 
Tarrant 
Honorable Bob McCoy 
1252112 
Court Reporter, County Criminal Court No. 3 
12 Months Probation, $1,500 Fine 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site