Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00049-CR    
02-17-00049-CR
02/28/2017
Injury to a Child, Elderly or Disabled Individual
David Michael Church 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/03/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
09/05/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/04/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
08/31/2018Memorandum opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
06/05/2018Submitted 
05/15/2018Set for submission on briefs 
01/04/2018Case ready to be set 
01/03/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/19/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/18/2017Notice of late brief 
10/09/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/05/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/23/2017Notice of late brief 
06/12/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/12/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/08/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
04/17/2017Letter received 
04/16/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/04/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
04/04/2017Telephone call received 
02/28/2017Notice to trial court that certification is missing 
02/28/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/15/2018StatusRelease to publisher
10/25/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasCasey Polhemus
Church, David MichaelCriminal - AppellantJ. Bruce Harris
Trial Court Information
97th District Court 
Archer 
Honorable Jack A. McGaughey 
2015-0024A-CR 
Court Reporter, Archer, Clay, And Montague Counties 
10 Yrs IDTDCJ, $840.00 Fine 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site