Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00045-CR    
02-17-00045-CR
02/22/2017
Aggravated Assault
Donald Dwayne Graves 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/20/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
09/20/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/02/2018Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
03/05/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
03/01/2018Case forwarded to higher court 
02/27/2018Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals 
02/15/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
01/23/2018Submitted 
01/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
10/20/2017Case ready to be set 
10/20/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/20/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
08/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/19/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/19/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/20/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/18/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/17/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
04/17/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
04/17/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposed 
04/17/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
03/07/2017Docketing statement filed 
02/22/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/27/2018Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Graves, Donald DwayneCriminal - AppellantEric Labovitz
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasSteven Baker
Joseph W. Spence
Trial Court Information
371st District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Mollee Westfall 
1445831D 
Court Reporter, 371st District Court 
Life IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site