Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00041-CR    
02-17-00041-CR
02/21/2017
Poss of a Controlled Substance
Ian Fanchon Gillespie 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/29/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
08/17/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/29/2018Mandate issuedAffirmed
03/05/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
02/08/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
02/01/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
01/23/2018Submitted 
01/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
09/29/2017Case ready to be set 
09/29/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/18/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/17/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/07/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/23/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/27/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/24/2017Docketing statement filed 
02/21/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/29/2018Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gillespie, Ian FanchonCriminal - AppellantBryan Bufkin
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasRobert T. Christian
Megan Chalifoux
Trial Court Information
355th District Court 
Hood 
Honorable Ralph H. Walton, 
CR11992 
Court Reporter, 355th District Court 
35 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site