Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00039-CR    
02-17-00039-CR
02/16/2017
Miscellaneous/Other Criminal including Misdemeanor or Felony
Rosa Maria Ortega 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/10/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
10/11/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/15/2018Set for submission on briefs 
02/09/2018Order entered 
01/10/2018Case ready to be set 
01/10/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
12/15/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/14/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/10/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/08/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/11/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/12/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/08/2017Appearance of counsel 
09/06/2017Appearance of counsel 
07/12/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/10/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/12/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/09/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
03/09/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
02/27/2017Docketing statement filed 
02/16/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/05/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasAli Nasser
Joseph W. Spence
Jonathan S. White
Ortega, Rosa MariaCriminal - AppellantDavid A. Pearson, IV
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3 
Tarrant 
Honorable Robb Catalano 
1434155D 
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 3 
Cts. 1 & 2 - 8 Yrs IDTDCJ ea ct. 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site