Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00033-CR    
02-17-00033-CR
02/09/2017
Aggravated Assault
James Ray Gober 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/22/2017Reply brief filedAppellant
12/11/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
10/20/2017Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/13/2018Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
05/16/2018Case forwarded to higher court 
05/14/2018Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals 
03/28/2018Letter received 
03/12/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
02/08/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
01/17/2018Submitted 
12/22/2017Reply brief filed 
12/14/2017Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
12/12/2017Case ready to be set 
12/11/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/17/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/16/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/24/2017Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/23/2017Motion for leave filed 
10/20/2017Brief received - oral argument requested 
09/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/20/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/07/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/06/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
06/02/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/23/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
02/09/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/14/2018Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gober, James RayCriminal - AppellantBlake R. Burns
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Edward L. Wilkinson
Trial Court Information
396th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable George William Gallagher 
1448913D 
Court Reporter, 396th District Court 
20 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site