Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-16-00449-CR    
02-16-00449-CR
11/23/2016
Theft
Dustin Cole Clearman 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/18/2017Brief was not filedState
09/29/2017Anders brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/23/2018Mandate issuedAffirmed
05/24/2018Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/24/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
05/22/2018Submitted 
05/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
12/18/2017Case ready to be set 
12/18/2017Brief was not filed 
11/10/2017Response was not filed 
10/05/2017Letter issued by the court 
10/05/2017Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
09/29/2017Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
09/29/2017Letter filed 
09/29/2017Letter filed 
09/29/2017Anders brief filed 
09/29/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
09/21/2017Case reinstated 
09/21/2017Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/28/2017Order issuedAbated
08/11/2017Notice of late brief 
05/16/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/16/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/12/2017Notice of late brief 
04/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/10/2017Notice of late brief 
03/22/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/07/2017Notice of late brief 
01/24/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
01/11/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/09/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
01/06/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
12/23/2016Docketing statement filed 
11/28/2016Order received from trial court 
11/23/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/2018Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Clearman, Dustin ColeCriminal - AppellantDustin Cole Clearman
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJennifer Ponder
Trial Court Information
78th District Court 
Wichita 
Honorable W. Bernard Fudge 
57,414-B 
Court Reporter, 78th District Court 
1 Year State Jail 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site