Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-16-00386-CR    
02-16-00386-CR
10/11/2016
Burglary of a Habitation
Chase Karrenbrock 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedState
12/28/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/11/2018Letter received 
05/08/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
04/17/2018Case ready to be set 
04/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/28/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/28/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
12/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/17/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/28/2017Letter issued by the court 
09/26/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
09/25/2017Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
09/25/2017Case reinstated 
09/07/2017Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/01/2017Motion filed 
08/30/2017Motion filed 
08/15/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
07/18/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
06/20/2017Order issuedAbated
06/20/2017Motion to abate appeal disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/17/2017Response filed 
05/10/2017Motion to stay disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/02/2017Certificate of conference filed 
05/02/2017Motion to abate appeal filed 
05/02/2017Letter filed 
05/01/2017Motion to stay filed 
03/17/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/15/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/16/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
01/27/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/27/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
11/18/2016Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
10/17/2016Docketing statement filed 
10/11/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/30/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasCatherine Luft
Matthew J. Whitten
Karrenbrock, ChaseCriminal - AppellantJ. Jeffrey Springer
Trial Court Information
158th District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Steve Burgess 
F15-927-158 
Court Reporter, 158th District Court 
60 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site