Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-16-00376-CR    
02-16-00376-CR
10/04/2016
Harassment by person in Correctional Facility
Lorenzo Emanuel 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/18/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
06/23/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
08/18/2017Case ready to be set 
08/18/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/23/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/20/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
12/12/2016Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
11/04/2016Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/03/2016Order received from trial court 
11/01/2016Notice filed 
10/04/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Emanuel, LorenzoCriminal - AppellantBrian Salvant
Adam L. Arrington
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasCatherine Luft
Trial Court Information
431st District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Jonathan M. Bailey 
F16-1098-431 
Court Reporter, 431st District Court 
30 Yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site