Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-16-00374-CR    
02-16-00374-CR
10/03/2016
Continuous Sexual Abuse of Young Child or Children
James R. Hernandez 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/04/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
09/06/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
08/17/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
08/09/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
05/22/2018Submitted 
05/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
12/04/2017Case ready to be set 
12/04/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
10/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/06/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/25/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/24/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
03/22/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/16/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
03/13/2017Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/27/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
02/27/2017Case reinstated 
02/07/2017Order issuedAbated
02/07/2017Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/01/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
01/30/2017Notice of late record 
01/20/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
10/14/2016Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
10/13/2016Docketing statement filed 
10/03/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/24/2018StatusRelease to publisher
11/09/2018StatusPetition for discretionary review due in Court of Criminal Appeals
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hernandez, James R.Criminal - AppellantAdam L. Arrington
Brian Salvant
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Helena F. Faulkner
Trial Court Information
297th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable David C. Hagerman 
1413902D 
Court Reporter, 297th District Court 
35 Yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site