Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-16-00373-CR    
02-16-00373-CR
10/03/2016
Miscellaneous/Other Criminal including Misdemeanor or Felony
James R. Hernandez 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/04/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
09/06/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
08/17/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
08/09/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
05/22/2018Submitted 
05/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
12/04/2017Case ready to be set 
12/04/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
10/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filedMotion or Writ Granted
09/06/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/25/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/24/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
03/22/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/16/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
03/13/2017Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/27/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
02/27/2017Case reinstated 
02/07/2017Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/07/2017Order issuedAbated
02/01/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
01/30/2017Notice of late record 
01/20/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
10/14/2016Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
10/13/2016Docketing statement filed 
10/03/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/24/2018StatusRelease to publisher
11/09/2018StatusPetition for discretionary review due in Court of Criminal Appeals
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hernandez, James R.Criminal - AppellantBrian Salvant
Adam L. Arrington
James R. Hernandez
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Helena F. Faulkner
Trial Court Information
297th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable David C. Hagerman 
1413791D 
Court Reporter, 297th District Court 
2 Yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site