Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-16-00330-CR    
02-16-00330-CR
08/31/2016
Miscellaneous/Other Criminal including Misdemeanor or Felony
Francisco Domingo Vela 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/24/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
07/10/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
08/24/2017Case ready to be set 
08/24/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
08/09/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/08/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/10/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/07/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/08/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/04/2017Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/03/2017Original exhibits filed 
05/02/2017Order entered 
05/01/2017Motion filed 
03/15/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/10/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/06/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
02/06/2017Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/06/2017Case reinstated 
02/06/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
01/27/2017Order issuedAbated
01/20/2017Order entered 
01/13/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/12/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
12/09/2016Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/08/2016Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
11/28/2016Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/21/2016Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
11/01/2016Extension of time to file reporters record disposed 
10/31/2016Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
10/24/2016Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
09/13/2016Docketing statement filed 
08/31/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Vela, Francisco DomingoCriminal - AppellantMike Berger
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasSteven W. Conder
Debra A. Windsor
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1 
Tarrant 
Honorable Elizabeth Beach 
1423218D 
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 1 
20 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site