Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-16-00288-CR    
02-16-00288-CR
07/20/2016
Poss of a Controlled Substance
Thomas Wayne Lester 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/25/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
05/26/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/23/2018Submitted 
01/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
08/28/2017Case ready to be set 
08/25/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/20/2017Certificate of service filed 
06/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/26/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/29/2017Letter received 
03/29/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/30/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/28/2016Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
12/15/2016Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/13/2016Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
11/15/2016Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/14/2016Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
10/18/2016Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/11/2016Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
09/13/2016Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/12/2016Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
09/09/2016Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
07/22/2016Docketing statement filed 
07/20/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/23/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasDavid M. Curl
Joseph W. Spence
Lester, Thomas WayneCriminal - AppellantAdam L. Arrington
Brian Salvant
Trial Court Information
297th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable David C. Hagerman 
1366479D 
Rachel Morris, 
35 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site