Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-16-00244-CV    
02-16-00244-CV
07/12/2016
Miscellaneous/other civil
James McGibney and ViaView, Inc. 
Neal Rauhauser 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/10/2017Amicus curiae brief received 
06/16/2017Post submission brief filedAppellee
06/09/2017Amicus curiae brief received 
06/06/2017Reply brief filedAppellee
03/13/2017Reply brief filedAppellant
02/21/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
12/09/2016Amended brief filedAppellant
12/02/2016Appendix filedAppellant
11/21/2016Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
07/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
05/31/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
05/31/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
04/19/2018Opinion issuedAffirmed in Part and Reversed & Remanded in Part
08/23/2017Notice filed 
07/10/2017Amicus curiae brief received 
06/16/2017Post submission brief filed 
06/13/2017Submitted 
06/12/2017Letter filed 
06/09/2017Amicus curiae brief received 
06/06/2017Reply brief filed 
06/05/2017Assignment of visiting judge 
05/01/2017Motion to postpone oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/27/2017Motion to postpone oral argument filed 
03/28/2017Set for submission on oral argument 
03/13/2017Reply brief filed 
03/06/2017Letter received 
02/27/2017Case ready to be set 
02/21/2017Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/17/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/11/2017Record Sent 
01/11/2017Letter received 
01/11/2017Record Sent 
01/10/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
12/22/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/21/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/09/2016Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/09/2016Amended brief filed 
12/07/2016Record Sent 
12/07/2016Motion for leave filed 
12/07/2016Record Sent 
12/06/2016Certificate of service filed 
12/05/2016Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
12/02/2016Appendix filed 
11/22/2016Corrected brief requested 
11/21/2016Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
11/09/2016Record Sent 
10/26/2016Record Sent 
10/26/2016Record Sent 
10/25/2016Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
09/21/2016Record Sent 
09/21/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/20/2016Record Sent 
09/20/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/14/2016Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
09/13/2016Record Sent 
09/12/2016Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/30/2016Reporters record due 
08/26/2016Letter received 
08/25/2016Letter received 
08/12/2016Extension of time to file clerks record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/12/2016Extension of time to file clerks record filed 
08/11/2016Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
07/26/2016Docketing statement filed 
07/22/2016Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
07/12/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/31/2018Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
McGibney, JamesAppellantEvan Stone
Rauhauser, NealAppelleeJeffrey L. Dorrell
Via View, Inc. AppellantEvan Stone
Trial Court Information
67th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Donald J. Cosby 
067-270669-14 
Court Reporter, 67th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site