Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-16-00173-CR    
02-16-00173-CR
05/02/2016
Misapp. of Fid. Prop. or Prop. of Financial Inst.
Eddie Offiong Ette 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/22/2016Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
11/15/2016Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
10/18/2016Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/13/2017Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
05/31/2017Case forwarded to higher court 
05/26/2017Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals 
05/18/2017Opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
05/18/2017Opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
02/22/2017Submitted 
02/01/2017Set for submission on briefs 
01/24/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/22/2016Electronic reply brief filed 
11/16/2016Case ready to be set 
11/15/2016Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
10/18/2016Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
10/14/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/10/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/07/2016Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/05/2016Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/04/2016Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
07/08/2016Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/06/2016Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
06/09/2016Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/08/2016Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
05/27/2016Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
05/26/2016Letter filed 
05/18/2016Docketing statement filed 
05/02/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/26/2017Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasSteven W. Conder
Debra A. Windsor
Ette, Eddie OffiongCriminal - AppellantDaniel Collins
Trial Court Information
297th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable David C. Hagerman 
1363508D 
Court Reporter, 297th District Court 
10 Yrs, Probation 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site