Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-16-00050-CV    
02-16-00050-CV
02/12/2016
Miscellaneous/other civil
Richard Seim and Linda Seim 
Allstate Texas Lloyds and Lisa Scott 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
09/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
10/17/2016Reply brief filedAppellant
10/10/2016Reply brief filedAppellee
07/21/2016Reply brief filedAppellant
07/01/2016Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
05/04/2016Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/03/2018Set for submission on briefs 
10/03/2018Case ready to be set 
10/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/31/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/16/2018Letter issued by the court 
08/09/2018Case remanded from higher court 
08/09/2018Mandate issuedReversed and Remanded
06/29/2018Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/25/2017Case forwarded to higher court 
06/19/2017Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
05/04/2017Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
05/04/2017Motion for en banc reconsideration disposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/22/2017Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing enbanc disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/17/2017Motion for en banc reconsideration filed 
03/15/2017Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing enbanc filed 
02/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing enbanc disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing enbanc filed 
02/09/2017Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
10/18/2016Submitted 
10/17/2016Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/17/2016Reply brief filed 
10/14/2016Motion for leave filed 
10/10/2016Reply brief filed 
09/06/2016Assignment of visiting judge 
09/06/2016Set for submission on oral argument 
08/03/2016Record Sent 
07/21/2016Reply brief filed 
07/05/2016Case ready to be set 
07/01/2016Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/20/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/20/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/16/2016Record Sent 
05/04/2016Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/28/2016Record Sent 
04/26/2016Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
03/30/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/29/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/22/2016Record Sent 
03/16/2016Order entered 
03/07/2016Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
03/01/2016Deadline for parties to select mediator 
02/26/2016Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
02/26/2016Docketing statement filed 
02/12/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/24/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Allstate Texas LloydsAppelleeDavid G. Allen
Clinton David Howie
Scott, LisaAppelleeDavid G. Allen
Clinton David Howie
Seim, LindaAppellantAndrew B. Bender
Seim, RichardAppellantAndrew B. Bender
Trial Court Information
141st District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable John P. Chupp 
141-270531-14 
Court Reporter, 141st District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site