Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-15-00170-CR    
02-15-00170-CR
05/22/2015
Appeal From a Pretrial Order
The State of Texas 
Connie Torrez 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/21/2015Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
10/30/2015Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/10/2016Mandate issuedReversed and Remanded
10/19/2016Case returned from higher court 
09/21/2016Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
06/08/2016Case forwarded to higher court 
06/07/2016Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals 
05/12/2016Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/01/2016Submitted 
01/14/2016Objection disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/06/2016Objection filed 
12/30/2015Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
12/21/2015Case ready to be set 
12/21/2015Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/20/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/17/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/30/2015Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
10/01/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/29/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/08/2015Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
09/01/2015Letter filed 
08/20/2015Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/20/2015Case reinstated 
07/29/2015Order issuedAbated
07/29/2015Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/21/2015Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
07/20/2015Motion to withdraw attorney filedMotion or Writ No Action Taken
07/06/2015Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
06/11/2015Docketing statement filed 
06/05/2015Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/22/2015Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/10/2016Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasAppellantTanya S. Dohoney
Debra A. Windsor
Torrez, ConnieAppelleeBarry J. Alford
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 1 
Tarrant 
Honorable David E. Cook 
1399530 
Court Reporter, County Criminal Court No. 1 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site