First Court of Appeals

Case: 01-17-00773-CV    
01-17-00773-CV
10/11/2017
Contract
Evian Johnson and Mellanie M. Walton 
Pamela Lee & Donny Lee 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
www.txcourts.gov/1stcoa 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/15/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
07/10/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/14/2018Motion for rehearing due 
10/30/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirm TC judgment
10/09/2018Submitted 
09/11/2018Set for submission on briefs 
09/04/2018Reply brief due 
08/31/2018Appellees brief due 
08/15/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
08/15/2018Case ready to be set 
08/09/2018Appellees brief due 
08/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/23/2018Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/10/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/10/2018Appellants brief due 
06/25/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/21/2018Motion to dismiss filed 
06/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/30/2018Appellants brief due 
04/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/12/2018Response due 
04/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/02/2018Notice of late brief 
03/13/2018Fee paid 
03/12/2018Response due 
03/02/2018Notice of late brief 
02/26/2018Appellants brief due 
02/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/05/2018Response due 
01/24/2018Notice of late brief 
01/03/2018Appellants brief due 
12/04/2017Clerks record filed 
11/27/2017Court fee due 
11/27/2017Response due 
11/02/2017Past due court fee notice 
11/01/2017Court fee due 
11/01/2017Docketing statement due 
10/27/2017No clerks record filed in civil case 
10/24/2017Record due 
10/13/2017Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
10/11/2017Case began in court of appeals 
10/11/2017Notice of appeal received 
10/10/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
07/26/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
06/26/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/14/2018StatusMotion for rehearing due
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Evian Johnson and Mellanie M. WaltonAppellantDerek Deyon  
Pamela Lee & Donny Lee AppelleeNeil A. Bickley
Trial Court Information
270th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Judge 270th District Court 
2017-20412 
Court Reporter 270th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site