First Court of Appeals

Case: 01-17-00067-CV    
01-17-00067-CV
01/26/2017
Contract
David Pollitt 
Computer Comforts, Incorporated 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
www.txcourts.gov/1stcoa 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/27/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
06/28/2017Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/19/2018Motion for rehearing due 
10/04/2018Memorandum opinion issuedModify TC judgment and affirm TC judgment as modified
10/04/2018Judgment Issued 
09/26/2018Submitted 
08/29/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
02/13/2018Case ready to be set 
10/02/2017Response due 
09/20/2017Notice of late brief 
08/28/2017Appellees brief due 
07/27/2017Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
07/27/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/27/2017Rehearing 
06/29/2017Motion to reinstate filed 
06/28/2017Motion for rehearing filed 
06/28/2017Brief received - oral argument requested 
06/28/2017Motion for rehearing due 
06/13/2017Memorandum opinion issuedDismiss appeal
06/13/2017Judgment Issued 
06/12/2017Submitted 
05/22/2017Response due 
05/11/2017Notice of late brief 
05/02/2017Appellants brief due 
04/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/10/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/10/2017Response due 
03/31/2017Notice of late brief 
03/23/2017Appellants brief due 
02/21/2017Clerks record filed 
02/21/2017Document filed 
02/21/2017Record due 
02/15/2017Court fee due 
02/15/2017Docketing statement due 
02/14/2017Fee paid 
01/30/2017Court reporters information sheet sent 
01/26/2017Case began in court of appeals 
01/26/2017Notice of appeal received 
01/23/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
11/22/2016Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
10/24/2016Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/19/2018StatusMotion for rehearing due
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Computer Comforts, IncorporatedAppelleeGainey M. Johnson  
Pollitt, DavidAppellantGeorge W. Vie III
Trial Court Information
212th District Court 
Galveston 
Honorable Judge 212th District Court 
11-CV-1203 
Jennifer Hall 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site