First Court of Appeals

Case: 01-15-00969-CV    
01-15-00969-CV
11/19/2015
Contract
Ali Yazdchi 
BBVA Compass Bank 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
www.txcourts.gov/1stcoa 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/17/2017Appendix filedAppellant
10/25/2016Reply brief filedAppellant
09/14/2016Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
08/15/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/02/2018Mandate issued 
01/26/2018Document filed 
01/26/2018Notice received 
12/27/2017Notice received 
12/08/2017Petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtSC denies petition for review
10/25/2017Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
10/25/2017Petition for review due in Supreme Court 
09/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
09/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
09/25/2017Petition for review due in Supreme Court 
08/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
08/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
07/11/2017Motion for en banc reconsideration disposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/23/2017Motion for rehearing en banc filed 
06/08/2017Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/17/2017Appendix filed 
05/17/2017Motion for rehearing filed 
05/17/2017Motion for rehearing due 
05/16/2017Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/12/2017Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
05/10/2017Motion for rehearing due 
04/25/2017Memorandum opinion issuedAffirm TC judgment
04/25/2017Judgment Issued 
04/11/2017Submitted 
03/02/2017Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
10/26/2016Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/25/2016Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
10/25/2016Reply brief filed 
10/14/2016Supplemental clerks record filed 
09/14/2016Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/14/2016Case ready to be set 
09/14/2016Appellees brief due 
08/30/2016Record Sent 
08/29/2016Supplemental reporters record filed 
08/15/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
08/02/2016Appellants brief due 
08/02/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedExtension of time to file GRANTED, with no further extensions
07/25/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/27/2016Appellants brief due 
06/23/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/20/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/13/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/13/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/13/2016Appellants brief due 
05/12/2016Appellants brief due 
05/11/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/10/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/12/2016Appearance of counsel 
04/12/2016Judgment withdrawn 
04/12/2016Opinion withdrawn 
04/12/2016Rehearing 
04/12/2016Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
02/22/2016Response due 
02/18/2016Response filed 
02/12/2016Response requested by the court 
02/10/2016Amended motion for rehearing filed 
02/10/2016Motion for rehearing filed 
02/10/2016Motion for rehearing due 
01/26/2016Memorandum opinion issuedWithdraw this Court's opinion
01/26/2016Judgment withdrawn 
01/25/2016Submitted 
01/13/2016Court fee due 
01/08/2016Response filed 
01/08/2016Response filed 
12/30/2015Record Sent 
12/29/2015Motion to dismiss filed 
12/28/2015Reporters record filed 
12/14/2015Past due court fee notice 
12/10/2015Court fee due 
12/10/2015Docketing statement due 
12/01/2015Appellants brief due 
11/25/2015Record Sent 
11/24/2015Notification received that no record was taken 
11/24/2015Court reporters information sheet sent 
11/20/2015Clerks record filed 
11/19/2015Case began in court of appeals 
11/19/2015Notice of appeal received 
11/09/2015Record due 
10/08/2015Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
07/10/2015Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/02/2018Case StoredCase stored
02/02/2024RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Yazdchi, Ali AppellantAli Yazdchi
BBVA Compass BankAppelleeMichael D. Conner
William Patterson Huttenbach
Trial Court Information
152nd District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Judge 152nd District Court 
2015-05657 
Cynthia M. Montalvo 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site