First Court of Appeals

Case: 01-15-00438-CV    
01-15-00438-CV
05/12/2015
Contract
Ali Yazdchi 
Mike Jones and Sam Adamo 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
Thomson/West 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/21/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
03/23/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/21/2017Mandate issued 
04/07/2017Document filed 
04/07/2017Notice received 
02/28/2017Notice received 
02/10/2017Petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtSC denies petition for review
12/05/2016Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
12/05/2016Petition for review due in Supreme Court 
11/07/2016Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
11/04/2016Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
11/04/2016Letter received 
09/30/2016Sent to publisher 
09/20/2016Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied
08/26/2016Supplemental clerks record filed 
08/25/2016Amended motion for rehearing filed 
08/24/2016Exhibits filed 
08/24/2016Motion for rehearing en banc filed 
08/24/2016Motion for rehearing en banc filed 
08/09/2016Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/01/2016Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/01/2016Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
08/01/2016Amended motion for rehearing filed 
07/29/2016Motion for rehearing filed 
07/29/2016Motion for rehearing due 
07/14/2016Opinion issuedAffirm TC judgment
07/14/2016Judgment Issued 
06/28/2016Submitted 
06/10/2016Motion filed 
05/23/2016Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
05/18/2016Case ready to be set 
05/16/2016Response due 
05/05/2016Notice of late brief 
04/22/2016Appellees brief due 
04/21/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/23/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/23/2016Appellants brief due 
02/23/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion to extend time; absent extraordinary circumstances, Court will not grant additional motions to extend time
02/22/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/22/2016Appearance of counsel 
02/22/2016Appellants brief due 
02/01/2016Record Sent 
01/27/2016Supplemental clerks record filed 
01/27/2016Motion disposedDenied as moot
01/27/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/21/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/21/2016Appellants brief due 
12/23/2015Record Sent 
12/23/2015Reporters record due 
12/22/2015Reporters record filed 
12/21/2015Reporters record filed 
12/02/2015Record Sent 
12/01/2015Indigent status for costs of appeal confirmed 
12/01/2015Order enteredIssue sua sponte order
11/16/2015Supplemental clerks record due 
11/06/2015Supplemental clerks record filed 
11/05/2015Order enteredIssue sua sponte order
11/03/2015Exhibits filed 
10/19/2015Letter filed 
10/19/2015Letter filed 
10/16/2015Court reporters information sheet sent 
10/15/2015Motion filed 
10/15/2015Response due 
09/15/2015No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record 
09/15/2015Court reporters information sheet sent 
09/11/2015Clerks record filed 
09/11/2015Supplemental clerks record filed 
09/08/2015Supplemental clerks record filed 
08/12/2015Appearance of counsel 
08/11/2015Supplemental clerks record filed 
07/10/2015Response due 
06/30/2015Document returned 
06/16/2015Notice filed 
06/10/2015No reporters record filed in civil case 
06/10/2015No clerks record filed in civil case 
06/08/2015Response due regarding jurisdiction 
06/08/2015Record due 
06/05/2015Letter issued by the court 
06/04/2015Letter filed 
06/02/2015Notice of appeal received 
06/01/2015Court fee due 
06/01/2015Docketing statement due 
05/28/2015Letter issued by the court for lack of jurisdiction or defect 
05/22/2015Document returned 
05/12/2015Case began in court of appeals 
05/12/2015Notice of appeal received 
05/07/2015Affidavit of indigence for costs of appeal filed in trial court 
05/07/2015Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
04/09/2015Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/21/2017Case StoredCase stored
04/21/2023RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Yazdchi, Ali AppellantAshley Burleson
Adamo, SamAppelleeWilliam Gibson Hagans
William Fred Hagans
Jones, Mike AppelleeMike Jones
Trial Court Information
11th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Judge 11th District Court 
2015-05013 
Court Reporter 11th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site