First Court of Appeals

Case: 01-15-00044-CV    
01-15-00044-CV
01/08/2015
Real Property
Tanya L. McCabe Trust, McCabe Family Trust, and The Rochford Living Trust 
Ranger Energy LLC 
No 
9th Court of Appeals 
01/08/2015 
09-14-00552-CV 
 
 
Thomson/West 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/15/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
03/13/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/11/2017Mandate issued 
08/03/2017Document filed 
06/23/2017Petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtSC denies petition for review
04/10/2017Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
02/24/2017Sent to publisher 
02/23/2017Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied
02/23/2017Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied
01/25/2017Response due 
01/17/2017Response filed 
01/11/2017Response requested by the court 
01/06/2017Motion for rehearing en banc filed 
01/06/2017Motion for rehearing filed 
01/06/2017Motion for rehearing due 
12/22/2016Opinion issuedOpinion dissenting to this Court's judgment
12/22/2016Opinion issuedReverse TC judgment and remand case to TC for further proceedings
12/22/2016Judgment Issued 
10/20/2015Submitted 
09/24/2015Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
05/05/2015Reply brief due 
04/15/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/15/2015Case ready to be set 
04/15/2015Appellees brief due 
04/01/2015Letter filed 
03/16/2015Appellants brief due 
03/16/2015Response due 
03/13/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/26/2015Response due 
02/25/2015Letter filed 
02/18/2015Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
02/13/2015Letter filed 
02/13/2015Notification received that no record was taken 
02/13/2015Court reporters information sheet sent 
02/12/2015Clerks record filed 
02/12/2015Notice of late record 
01/27/2015No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record 
01/26/2015Clerks notice to court regarding status of record 
01/23/2015Document filed 
01/23/2015Letter filed 
01/08/2015Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
01/08/2015Order enteredCase transferred to another COA
01/08/2015Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase transferred to another COA
12/18/2014Court fee due 
12/18/2014Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/11/2023RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
10/11/2017Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The Rochford Living TrustAppellantKeith C. Thompson
Ranger Energy LLCAppelleeMark Harmon
McCabe Family TrustAppellantKeith C. Thompson
Tanya L. McCabe TrustAppellantKeith C. Thompson
Trial Court Information
356th District Court 
Hardin 
Honorable Steven R. Thomas 
54138 
Deborah Walters 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site