First Court of Appeals

Case: 01-12-00617-CV
07/02/2012
Interlocutory
Stanislaw Burzynsk, M. D. d/b/a Burzynski Clinic 
Lola Quinlan 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
Thomson/West 
Trial Court Information
269th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Hon. Dan Hinde 
1203429 
Kathleen Keese 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionDocument
04/24/2013Case stored  
11/21/2012Mandate issued  
11/21/2012Case stored  
08/24/2012Motion for rehearing due  
08/09/2012Memorandum opinion issued Dismiss appeal
08/09/2012Motion to dismiss disposedAppellantMotion or Writ Granted
08/09/2012Judgment Issued  
08/08/2012Submitted  
07/20/2012Motion to dismiss filedAppellant 
07/20/2012Court fee dueAppellant 
07/20/2012Docketing statement dueAppellant 
07/19/2012Letter filedAppellee 
07/10/2012Reporters record filedCourt Reporter 
07/10/2012Clerks record filedAppellant 
07/09/2012Reporters record dueCourt Reporter 
07/09/2012Record due  
07/02/2012Notice of appeal filed in trial court  
07/02/2012Notice of appeal receivedAppellant 
07/02/2012Case began in court of appeals  
07/02/2012Notice of appeal receivedAppellant 
06/28/2012Notice of appeal filed in trial court  
06/22/2012Judgment signed by trial court judge  
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/24/2013Case StoredDestroy 6 yrs after date of final disposition
11/21/2018RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Quinlan, LolaAppelleeJason A. Gibson
Andrew Smith  
Clifford Peel II
Richard A. Jaffe  
Stanislaw Burzynsk, M. D. d/b/a Burzynski ClinicAppellantMatthew Brendan E. Hughes
Melissa Astala Khan  

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site