First Court of Appeals

Case: 01-11-00683-CV    
01-11-00683-CV
08/15/2011
Mandamus/prohibition
In re John Doe a/k/a Trooper 
 
Yes 
 
 
 
 
 
Thomson/West 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/15/2011Petition for writ of mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/03/2014Document filed 
08/29/2014Document filed 
09/04/2013Case stored 
11/29/2012Motion for en banc reconsideration disposedDeny motion
10/10/2012Motion for en banc reconsideration filed 
09/26/2012Motion for rehearing disposedDeny motion
09/26/2012Order entered 
09/04/2012Response filed 
06/25/2012Response due 
06/18/2012Response filed 
06/05/2012Order enteredIssue sua sponte order
06/04/2012Fee paid 
06/04/2012Motion for rehearing filed 
06/04/2012Motion for rehearing due 
05/18/2012Memorandum opinion issuedDeny petition for writ of mandamus
05/17/2012Submitted 
05/14/2012Response filed 
09/15/2011Record filed 
09/15/2011Response filed 
09/15/2011Response due 
08/18/2011Order enteredDeny motion
08/18/2011Motion to stay disposedDeny motion
08/16/2011Certificate of conference filed 
08/16/2011Certificate of conference filed 
08/15/2011Notice filed 
08/15/2011Fee paid 
08/15/2011Record filed 
08/15/2011Motion to stay filed 
08/15/2011Petition for writ of mandamus filed 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/04/2013Case StoredCase stored
11/29/2018RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The Reynolds and Reynolds CompanyReal party in interestAngus Joseph Dodson
Brian T. Ross
Grant J Harvey
Aundrea Kristine Frieden
Brockman, Robert T.Real party in interestGrant J Harvey
Aundrea Kristine Frieden
Brian T. Ross
Angus Joseph Dodson
Google, Inc.Real party in interestDennis M Lynch
John Doe a/k/a TrooperRelatorJoshua H. Northam
Shelly L. Skeen
James D. Blume
Dealer Computer Services, Inc.Real party in interestGrant J Harvey
Aundrea Kristine Frieden
Brian T. Ross
Angus Joseph Dodson
Trial Court Information
152nd District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Robert Schaffer 
1013724 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site